WY HB0140 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health insurance; specifying reimbursement requirements for mental health and substance use disorder benefits as specified; providing definitions; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mental Health care Access-Collaborative Care Model.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-9-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-21-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-21-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 132 | |
2023-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0068 | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0068 |
2023-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0068 |
2023-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0068 | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-9-0-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-17 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-21-1-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-27 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |