WY HB0136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; amending the use of pronouns on the ballot; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Inclusive ballot language.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea LeBeau [D] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Passed 38-19-3-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-20-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-20-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 145 | |
2021-04-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0081 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0081 |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0081 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0081 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Concur:Passed 38-19-3-0-0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-04-01 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | :Refer to S08 - Transportation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-20-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-22 | Bill Number Assigned |