WY HB0134 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - President Signed HEA No. 0083
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - President Signed HEA No. 0083
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways; modifying procedures for establishing private roads; conforming provisions; repealing specified provisions; specifying legislative intent; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Private roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0083 |
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0083 |
2013-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA0083 | |
2013-02-22 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-19 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-29 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |