WY HB0131 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to children; authorizing parents and guardians to enter into binding settlements on behalf of their minor children as specified; specifying limits on parental or guardian settlement authority; making conforming amendments; providing a cause of action; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Settlement agreements for minors-parental authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 56-5-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 56-5-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-21 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 56-5-1-0-0 |
2024-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-07 | Bill Number Assigned |