WY HB0131 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; authorizing the department of workforce services to accept assignment of wage claims; authorizing the department to bring legal action regarding assigned wage claims; authorizing the department to investigate certain activities to aid enforcement of laws related to wages; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wage claim assignment and investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-26 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-07 | Bill Number Assigned |