WY HB0127 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the public health; amending and creating provisions governing the issuance of orders relating to the public health; amending provisions governing the appointment and oversight of the state health officer; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Adopted HB0127JC001: 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Adopted HB0127JC001: 35-18-7-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Failed 19-38-3-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-10-1-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22 Assigned Chapter Number 168
2021-04-22 Became Law without Signature
2021-04-07SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0093
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0093
2021-04-07 Assigned Number HEA No. 0093
2021-04-06SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06HouseConcur:Failed 19-38-3-0-0
2021-04-06HouseReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-10-1-0-0
2021-04-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-04-01SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-29SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-29SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2021-03-26Senate:Refer to S02 - Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2021-03-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-24House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2021-03-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-22HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-08HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-08HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2021-02-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0127.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/HB0127.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/HB0127.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127H3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127H3002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127S3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0127JC001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0127.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Summaries/HB0127.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#-391
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#5252
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#-709
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#489
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#5416
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#5424
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0127#509

Bill Comments

feedback