WY HB0127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 10-16-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 10-16-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; amending eligibility criteria for the tax refund to the elderly and disabled program; providing for administration of the tax refund by the department of revenue; requiring rulemaking; authorizing a position; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Tax refund to elderly and disabled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - COW:Failed 10-16-4-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Failed 10-16-4-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-19 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |