WY HB0123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to juveniles; providing for expungement of juvenile records as specified; providing prosecutorial discretion to petition to postpone expungement; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Juvenile records-expungement.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Rep. Ken Esquibel [D] | Rep. Marti Halverson [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] |
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |