WY HB0119 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0046
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; authorizing school districts to bill for school based services for Medicaid eligible students as specified; providing reimbursement to school districts for administrative costs; providing appropriations; authorizing positions; authorizing a transfer of funds; requiring reports; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid billing for school-based services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30 Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0046
2020-03-30 Veto Message Received
2020-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0046
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0046
2020-03-09 Assigned Number HEA No. 0046
2020-03-09HouseConcur:Passed 44-14-2-0-0
2020-03-06HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0
2020-03-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-04SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-03SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-24House3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
2020-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-18HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-17House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 49-10-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback