WY HB0117 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pesticide registration; increasing a registration fee; specifying additional funding for the pesticide applicator certification program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pesticide applicator certification program funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0040 | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0040 | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-26 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-18 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-16 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 55-4-1-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |