WY HB0116 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; specifying landowner notice and public comment requirements for the sage grouse implementation team; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sage grouse implementation-notice to landowners.
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Angelos [R] | Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] |
Rep. Christopher Knapp [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Reuben Tarver [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-3-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-3-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 61 | |
2024-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0040 | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2024-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2024-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0040 | |
2024-03-05 | House | Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-3-0-0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-29 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-06 | Bill Number Assigned |