WY HB0116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; codifying the legislative stabilization reserve account; providing a limit on the amount of funds which may be deposited in the legislative stabilization reserve account; codifying the strategic investments and projects account; providing purposes for the accounts; providing for authorized expenditures from the accounts; creating the select committee on strategic investments and projects; providing for membership; providing duties; providing for a transfer of funds; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Strategic investments and projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dave Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0- (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0- (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0116.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0116.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0116.pdf |