WY HB0115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; lowering the minimum age at which a person may take a big or trophy game animal as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Big or trophy game animal-minimum hunting age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 94 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0048 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2021-03-30 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0048 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-25 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-09 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |