WY HB0114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - COW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child custody; providing a presumption for issuance of an order of shared custody as specified; providing definitions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shared parenting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - COW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Failed 18-39-3-0-0
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback