WY HB0109 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; regulating electronic monitoring in long-term care facilities; providing guidelines and obligations for facilities and residents; providing penalties and evidentiary standards; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Electronic monitoring in long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] |
Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Concur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-2-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-2-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assigned Chapter Number 126 | |
2020-03-17 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0089 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0089 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Concur:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-2-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 46-13-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |