WY HB0106 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - (S) Received for Introduction; No Further Action Prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - (S) Received for Introduction; No Further Action Prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government reorganization; providing for the merger of the programs and functions of the department of employment and the department of workforce services; specifying that the remaining department shall be known as the department of workforce services; requiring reports; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Departments of employment and workforce services-merger.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] |
Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] | Rep. Lisa Shepperson [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | (S) Received for Introduction; No Further Action Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Gay, Goggles and Lockhart. Ayes 56 Nays 0 Excused 4 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Craft, Gay, Gingery, Greene, Harvey, Hunt, Miller and Peasley Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0106.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0106.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0106.pdf |