WY HB0101 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Business Corporations Act; authorizing corporations to use electronic networks or databases for the creation or maintenance of corporate records; authorizing the use of a data address to identify a corporation's shareholder; authorizing corporations to accept shareholder votes if signed by a network signature that corresponds to a data address; specifying requirements for use of electronic networks or databases; requiring the secretary of state to review its rules for consistency with this act; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic corporate records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0022
2018-03-07HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0022
2018-03-06 Assigned Number HEA No. 0022
2018-03-06HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-03-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-01SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-28SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2018-02-21SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-20House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-16HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-15HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback