WY HB0099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state holidays and observances; providing for a public lands day; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming public lands day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 177
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0109
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0109
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0109
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0109
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-29SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28House3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0
2019-01-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-22HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback