WY HB0099 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; including special education teachers in the extrahazardous occupations category; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Worker's compensation for special education teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Ruth Petroff [R] |
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-18 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0099.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0099.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0099.htm |