WY HB0097 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing construction of designated water projects; describing projects; specifying terms and conditions of funding for projects; providing appropriations; providing for a sponsor's contingency fund; modifying project descriptions, amounts and terms of appropriations for specified prior projects; transferring funds from the Buffalo Bill dam account to water development account II; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill - construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted HB0097JC001: 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted HB0097JC001: 44-8-8-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Amendment adopted 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted HB0097JC001: 44-8-8-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Amendment adopted 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assigned Chapter Number 113 | |
2020-03-17 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0093 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0093 | |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-06 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-06 | House | Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-28 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |