WY HB0095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to local sales and use tax; authorizing the distribution and expenditure of excess taxes collected for a specific purpose under specified conditions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special purpose tax-excess funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - Concur:Passed 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 82
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0037
2019-02-19SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0037
2019-02-19HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0037
2019-02-15 Assigned Number HEA No. 0037
2019-02-15HouseConcur:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
2019-02-14HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-05SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28House3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0
2019-01-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-22HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback