WY HB0094 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Pharmacy Act; amending authority of pharmacists to administer immunizations; requiring parental consent for immunization of minor children; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Immunization by pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0077 |
2013-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0077 |
2013-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA0077 | |
2013-02-21 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-15 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-15 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-28 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-21 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |