WY HB0090 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; providing for voluntary student expression of religious expression in public schools; specifying requirements for school districts; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student religious liberties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-20-1-0 (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2015-02-03SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-02House3rd Reading:Passed 39-20-1-0-0
2015-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-27HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-27 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback