WY HB0086 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the probate code; creating a definition for summary probate procedures; specifying how distribution through intervening estates may take place; specifying limits for creditor claims to distributed property; amending procedures for summary probate distribution; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Summary probate procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 85 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0062 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0062 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0062 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0062 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |