WY HB0084 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to marketing homemade foods; authorizing the sale of certain homemade food items by parties other than the producer of the item as specified; providing and amending definitions; making conforming changes; repealing a provision relating to consumption location; providing limitations on retail food sales; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Food freedom amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 69 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0043 | |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0043 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Concur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-21 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |