WY HB0083 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employee retirement; requiring the calculation and collection of employee and employer contributions for the public employee retirement plan to be based on an actuarially determined contribution rate; specifying procedures for the calculation of rates; requiring reports; removing obsolete language; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Public retirement-actuarially determined contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-21-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 49-12-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-21-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 49-12-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 60 | |
2024-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0041 | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0041 |
2024-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0041 |
2024-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0041 | |
2024-03-05 | House | Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-21-0-0-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 49-12-1-0-0 |
2024-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |