WY HB0083 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-23-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-23-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; authorizing the governor to negotiate and enter into agreements with tribes concerning hunting, fishing, trapping and gathering rights claims as specified; providing for a report; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tribal agreements to hunt and fish.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Sandy Newsome [R] |
Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-23-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 8-23-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-14 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |