WY HB0078 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing that the department of transportation and the game and fish department shall submit proposed budgets to the budget division of the department of administration and information as specified; amending conflicting statutes; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Budget review process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA0034 | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2013-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2013-02-13 | Assigned Number HEA0034 | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-21 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-21 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-31 | Bill Number Assigned |