WY HB0077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing persons who have been issued disabled veteran's license plates to park in handicapped parking spaces as specified; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Disabled veteran's license plate-handicapped parking.
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Botten [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Rep. James Byrd [D] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] |
Rep. Ken Esquibel [D] | Sen. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Del McOmie [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] | Sen. Leslie Nutting [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-02-15 | Motion to Do Pass Failed | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0077.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0077.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0077.htm |