WY HB0076 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming public library endowment challenge program; extending time for gifting to program; providing that matching funds may be distributed to or encumbered by a public library foundation in excess of the amount within that library's challenge fund account under specified circumstances; modifying reversion dates; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public library endowment challenge program amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Chapter No. 104 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0074 | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0074 |
2015-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0074 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0074 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-18 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-21 | Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |