WY HB0075 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public property and buildings; amending and creating provisions related to budgeting, expenditure of funds and reporting for capital construction projects, major maintenance and routine maintenance; conforming and repealing definitions; amending requirements for contracting for public works; specifying duties related to capital construction projects, major maintenance and routine maintenance for the state construction department, the state building commission, school districts, the board of trustees of the University of Wyoming and the community college commission; repealing major maintenance funding requirements; requiring reports; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Public property-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-3-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-16-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-16-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-3-0-0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-28 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-22 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-16-1-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |