WY HB0075 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; specifying how property may be designated to prevent trespass by use of fluorescent orange or fluorescent pink paint; requiring the game and fish commission and the department of state parks and cultural resources to inform permittees concerning trespassing and rights-of-way through private land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Painted fence posts-no trespassing.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Allemand [R] | Rep. Dalton Banks [R] | Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Allen Slagle [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-24 | House | H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |