WY HB0075 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 189 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 189 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; amending requirements for restoration of voting rights to persons convicted of nonviolent felonies; repealing certain eligibility requirements for certificates of restoration of rights; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Automatic restoration of the right to vote.
Sponsors
Rep. James Byrd [D] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Debbie Bovee [D] |
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Joann Dayton-Selman [D] | Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Chapter No. 189 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0106 | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0106 |
2017-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0106 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0106 | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-24 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |