WY HB0075 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; establishing the physician orders for life sustaining treatment program; providing definitions; granting rulemaking authority; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Physicians' orders for life sustaining treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | (H) Died In Committee | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0075.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/HB0075.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0075.htm |