WY HB0074 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; providing a process for public health nursing employee compensation increases as specified to be included in the department of health's budget request; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public health nursing-budget requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-14-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-18-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-14-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-18-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 29 | |
2024-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0015 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2024-02-29 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0015 | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-2-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-14-0-0-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-18-1-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |