WY HB0073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to vital records; specifying how parents are listed on a birth certificate upon delivery by a surrogate; providing definitions; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birth certificates-gestational agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Concur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - Concur:Failed 13-47-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05 Assigned Chapter Number 87
2021-04-05 Governor Signed HEA No. 0057
2021-04-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0057
2021-04-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0057
2021-04-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0057
2021-03-31HouseConcur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 38-21-1-0-0
2021-03-31HouseConcur:Failed 13-47-0-0-0
2021-03-29SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-03-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-03-26HouseConcur:Failed 13-47-0-0-0
2021-03-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2021-03-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2021-03-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-23SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-22SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-03-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-09House3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0
2021-03-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-05HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-03HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-03HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-01-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-01-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0073.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/HB0073.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/HB0073.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073HW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073HW002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073S3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073S3002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0073JC001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0073.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#-275
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#5135
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#-594
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#371
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#5276
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0073#5343

Bill Comments

feedback