WY HB0072 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; creating a special committee to develop recommendations regarding a teacher merit pay plan; requiring a report; providing appropriations; providing for contingent repeal of the committee and transfer of the committee's functions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher merit pay.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
2011-02-15 (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-10 (S) Rereferred to S02
2011-02-09 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-09 (S04) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-31 (S) Introduced and Referred to S04
2011-01-25 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-20 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-19 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-18 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-17 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-17 (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-12 (H) Introduced and Referred to H04
2011-01-11 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback