WY HB0072 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to siting and regulation of wind energy facilities; requiring permitting by boards of county commissioners; establishing minimum standards for wind energy facilities; providing for the review of county permitting decisions; allowing counties to adopt requirements; providing for referrals to the industrial siting council; amending the industrial siting council's jurisdiction; requiring rulemaking; providing penalties; requiring fees; requiring financial assurances; providing an appropriation; authorizing the reclassification and filling of a vacant position; requiring counties to promulgate rules; providing conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of wind energy facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - Senate - S Adopted HB0072JC01 (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Delete the Hunnicutt, Bebout Second Reading Amendment (HB0072S2001/AE) entirely. PERKINS (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0064
2010-03-05 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0064
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0064
2010-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0064
2010-03-05 (S) Adopted HB0072JC01
2010-03-05 (H) Adopted HB0072JC01
2010-03-04 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-04 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-04 (H) Did Not Concur
2010-03-04 (H) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-26 (S) Rereferred to S02
2010-02-26 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (S09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S09
2010-02-23 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-19 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-18 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-15 (H) Rereferred to H02
2010-02-12 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-12 (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-10 (H) Introduced and Referred to H09
2010-02-09 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback