WY HB0071 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; amending duties and other provisions relating to the state coordinator; providing requirements for approval of federal land management actions by the state of Wyoming; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State coordinator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H05 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (H) Died In Committee | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0071.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/HB0071.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0071.htm |