WY HB0070 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; recognizing limitations on the regulatory authority of the occupational safety and health administration; providing legislative findings in relation to those limitations; specifying the policy of the state in regard to actions of the occupational safety and health administration; authorizing intervention by the attorney general to protect the interests of the state as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Occupational safety and health administration actions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0036 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0036 |
2017-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0036 |
2017-02-16 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0036 | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |