WY HB0067 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; requiring revenues from specified agricultural land to represent a portion of the owner's gross income as specified; requiring documentation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Determination of agricultural land for taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Digest/HB0067.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Introduced/HB0067.pdf |
Supplement | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Fiscal/HB0067.pdf |