WY HB0065 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing counties an option to participate in the state employees' and officials' group insurance plan; specifying participation and contribution requirements and procedures; implementing payment mechanisms for participating counties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State employees' group insurance-county employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-03-04 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-03-03 | House | Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2015-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-14 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |