WY HB0064 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health and safety; authorizing adults to possess and use hemp extract; eliminating registration requirements; authorizing a parent or guardian to administer hemp extract to a minor; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of hemp extracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-2-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07 S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2018-03-07SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-2-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-22HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-22HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 45-14-1-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback