WY HB0059 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to defense forces and affairs; extending existing educational assistance benefits for Wyoming national guard members in exchange for additional service commitments; allowing transfer of educational assistance benefits to spouses and dependents; correcting terminology; providing appropriations; authorizing a full-time position; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming national guard tuition benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-8-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 127 | |
2023-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0063 | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2023-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2023-02-23 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0063 | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-8-0-0-0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-17 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |