WY HB0055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to title and registration; authorizing the use of a copy of a title for the transport of a mobile home; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transport of mobile homes-copy of title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 188
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0111
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0111
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0111
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0111
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-21SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-16HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback