WY HB0054 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing a sales and use tax exemption for occasional sales of firearms as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hobby firearm dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Cannady [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Rep. Peter Illoway [R] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] |
Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. Lorraine Quarberg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0054.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0054.pdf |