WY HB0053 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public funds; providing for the investment of specified accounts; providing for the retention of investment earnings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education accounts-investment earnings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-26SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-14SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-14House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-11HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback