WY HB0053 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; creating a rebuttable presumption pertaining to ownership of vehicles registered under the laws of another jurisdiction for purposes of titling and registration; providing for notice and hearing as specified; providing a penalty; limiting admissibility of evidence in judicial proceedings as specified; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Vehicle registration-rebuttable presumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-20 | Bill Number Assigned |