WY HB0053 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to lotteries; creating the Wyoming lottery corporation; providing for membership of the board; providing legislative declarations; providing definitions; providing powers and duties; providing for rules and regulations; providing for use of proceeds for educational and other purposes; providing limitations on retailers; providing for criminal offenses and penalties; providing for pari-mutuel permits; amending a definition; providing for background checks; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming lottery for education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Rereferred to H07; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0053.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0053.pdf |