WY HB0051 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 111 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 111 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local government funding; providing funding to cities and towns; providing funding to counties; providing local government funding formulas; providing legislative intent; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Local government distributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0051JC002: 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0051JC002: 43-12-5-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 0-57-3-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0051JC002: 43-12-5-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 0-57-3-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Chapter No. 111 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-11 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0054 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2016-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0054 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Adopted HB0051JC002: 18-11-1-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | House | Adopted HB0051JC002: 43-12-5-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-02 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-02 | JCC Requested 2nd Committee to be Appointed | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-03-01 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-03-01 | House | Concur:Failed 0-57-3-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 |
2016-02-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 52-6-2-0-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |